Global Patent Index - EP 0955030 A3

EP 0955030 A3 2000-02-23 - Lying device for preventing pressure sores and /or treating pressure sores

Title (en)

Lying device for preventing pressure sores and /or treating pressure sores

Title (de)

Liegevorrichtung zur Dekupitusprophylaxe und/oder Dekupitusbehandlung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de couchage pour prévenir les escarres de décubitus et/ou traiter les escarres de décubitus

Publication

EP 0955030 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108385 A

Priority

DE 19820350 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955030A2] The apparatus includes underlying support material (7) wound on side shafts (4a,4b) for supporting the patient (9), which includes a pressure-reducing mat (8) made of porous or perforated foam material. The patient is freely suspended on the support material over mattress (3). The position of the patient on the support material (7) may be changed from side to side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/057 (2013.01); A61G 7/05707 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955030 A2 19991110; EP 0955030 A3 20000223; DE 19820350 A1 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021111

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI