Global Patent Index - EP 0955101 A3

EP 0955101 A3 2000-08-02 - Screening apparatus

Title (en)

Screening apparatus

Title (de)

Siebeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tamisage

Publication

EP 0955101 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108452 A

Priority

DE 19819866 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19819866C1] The sieve arrangement has a main sieve (2) and a pre-sieve (16) which is relatively movable with respect to the main sieve. Main (17) and auxiliary (18) beating units are associated with the main and pre-sieves respectively. Both sieves are cylindrical, with the pre-sieve and auxiliary beating unit being rotatable at various speeds, and the auxiliary beating unit being rotatably supported on the drive axle (7) of the pre-sieve. An auxiliary axle (23) drives the auxiliary beating unit via the drive axle, with both axles being associated with drive wheels (10,25) of differing operational diameter which are linked to a drive motor (14). The auxiliary beating unit is formed as a conveyor screw having a lower conveying power than a feed screw (5) of an intake (4) of the pre-sieve, and also has an air channel (30) and is supported at a flushing chamber (32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/20; B07B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/20 (2006.01); B07B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/24 (2013.01); B07B 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19819866 C1 19990415; EP 0955101 A2 19991110; EP 0955101 A3 20000802; EP 0955101 B1 20031126

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060516

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907833 P 20040108

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB LI NL

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI