Global Patent Index - EP 0955129 A3

EP 0955129 A3 2000-05-10 - Socket

Title (en)

Socket

Title (de)

Steckschlüsseleinsatz

Title (fr)

Douille

Publication

EP 0955129 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108515 A

Priority

  • DE 29807939 U
  • US 99868697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5943923A] A socket spanner is disclosed which includes a socket and a U-shaped elastic body. The socket includes: (1) a driven member, a drive member and an intermediate section located therebetween; (2) a pair of longitudinally extending grooves provided on an inner wall of the driven member opposite each other; and (3) a circumferentially disposed circular slot provided near an inner end of the inner wall of the driven member. The U-shaped elastic body includes: (1) two longitudinally extending arms connected by an arcuate bottom portion; (2) a protruded portion formed on one of the longitudinally extending arms of the U-shaped elastic body for exerting an urging force against a nut received by the driven member of the socket. The two longitudinally extending arms are completely received by the pair of longitudinally extending grooves, respectively, and the arcuate bottom portion is completely received in the circumferentially disposed circular slot provided near the inner end of the inner wall of the driven member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 13/06; B25B 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/06 (2006.01); B25B 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/06 (2013.01); B25B 23/108 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807939 U1 19980730; EP 0955129 A2 19991110; EP 0955129 A3 20000510; EP 0955129 B1 20020320; US 5943923 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030515

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030508

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901001 20020425

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-03-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214649 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI