Global Patent Index - EP 0955130 A3

EP 0955130 A3 2001-04-18 - Device for anchoring wedge dowels

Title (en)

Device for anchoring wedge dowels

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Einschlagen von Keildübeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enfoncer des chevilles de fixation du type à cale

Publication

EP 0955130 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107928 A

Priority

AT 75098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955130A2] A tubular sleeve (15) is closed at one end and the inner diameter of the hollow cavity (18) corresponds at least to the diameter of a drill shaft (10) which is used to drill the mounting hole for the dowel. The axial length of the hollow cavity of the sleeve is greater than the length of the drill shaft. The bottom of the sleeve has on the outside a center indentation (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 31/00 (2013.01); B25D 17/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955130 A2 19991110; EP 0955130 A3 20010418; AT 406409 B 20000525; AT A75098 A 19990915

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011019

2002-02-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI