Global Patent Index - EP 0955157 A3

EP 0955157 A3 2001-03-14 - Stamping tool and method for chemically and/or physically binding or stamping one or more layers of web-shaped materials

Title (en)

Stamping tool and method for chemically and/or physically binding or stamping one or more layers of web-shaped materials

Title (de)

Prägewerkzeug und Verfahren zum chemischen und/oder physikalischen Anbinden oder Prägen einer oder mehrerer Lagen bahnförmiger Materialien

Title (fr)

Outil d'estampage et procédé pour relier ou estamper chimiquement ou physiquement une ou plusieurs couches de matériaux en bande

Publication

EP 0955157 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108575 A

Priority

DE 19820268 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955157A2] The embossment surfaces (34,35,36,37), at least partly with different spacing, run at specific angles to a reference line (38,39) or to a reference surface of the embossment mould. The embossment moulds are cylinders, which in operation run opposed to each other, and the reference line is the actual rotary axis of the cylinders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/00; B29C 59/04; B31F 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2013.01); B31F 2201/072 (2013.01); B31F 2201/073 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0738 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0748 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0761 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0789 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955157 A2 19991110; EP 0955157 A3 20010314; DE 19820268 A1 19991111; DE 19820268 B4 20050105; DE 19820268 C5 20101223

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010915

2002-01-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31F 1/00 A, 7B 31F 1/07 B, 7B 29C 59/04 B

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI