Global Patent Index - EP 0955172 B1

EP 0955172 B1 2000-12-27 - Method and cassette for printing on a booklet-type object

Title (en)

Method and cassette for printing on a booklet-type object

Title (de)

Verfahren und Kassette zum Beschriften eines heftartigen Gegenstandes in einer Beschriftungsstation

Title (fr)

Procédé et cassette pour imprimer sur un objet du type livret

Publication

EP 0955172 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98108180 A

Priority

EP 98108180 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955172A1] The method involves arranging the object unfolded in a cassette (10) and conveying it to the marking station. The position of the edges of the page to be marked, in the station, and the position of a pattern on the sheet to be marked. The page is then marked such that parts of the marking are aligned with the pattern and other parts are aligned relative to the edge of the page. The cassette (10) has a base and a locating region and a frame (12). An Independent claim is included to cover a cassette for receiving the book or object.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/283 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955172 A1 19991110; EP 0955172 B1 20001227; EP 0955172 B2 20081126; AT 198293 T 20010115; DE 59800407 D1 20010201; DK 0955172 T3 20010409; DK 0955172 T4 20090316; ES 2154067 T3 20010316; HU 220567 B1 20020328; HU 9901516 A2 19991129; HU 9901516 A3 20000728; HU 9901516 D0 19990728; NO 331020 B1 20110912; NO 992164 A 19991108; NO 992164 D0 19990504; SG 74722 A1 20000822; US 6099175 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090505

2009-10-09 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090308

2009-04-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2009-03-16 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2009-03-10 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2009-01-30 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: MAURER ELECTRONICS GMBH;HANAUER STRASSE 1;80992 MUENCHEN (DE)

2008-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MAURER ELECTRONICS GMBH

- Effective date: 20081015

2008-11-28 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2008-11-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20081126

2008-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2008-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MAURER ELECTRONICS GMBH

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MAURER ELECTRONICS GMBH

- Free text: MAURER ELECTRONICS GMBH#NYMPHENBURGER STRASSE 154#80634 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MAURER ELECTRONICS GMBH#NYMPHENBURGER STRASSE 154#80634 MUENCHEN (DE)

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2002-10-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010927

2002-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-04-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154067 T3

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-02-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800407 20010201

2001-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198293 T 20010115

2000-07-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000131

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990323

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI