Global patent index - EP 0955184 A3

EP 0955184 A3 2000-05-03 - Thermal transfer recording medium

Title (en)

Thermal transfer recording medium

Title (de)

Thermisches Übertragungsaufzeichnungsmedium

Title (fr)

Milieu d'enregistrement par transfert thermique

Publication

EP 0955184 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99303526 A

Priority

JP 14039998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955184A2] A thermal transfer recording medium has a release layer mainly formed of waxes on a base material, an ink layer containing a colouring material, and a transparent adhesive layer on the base material in this order. A polyester resin having a glass transition temperature (Tg) of 70 DEG C to 80 DEG C, is used as the binder resin of the adhesive layer, which prevents the ink being set off during preservation, and confers excellent heat sensitivity and a satisfactory abrasion resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 31/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/392 (2006.01); B41M 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0487727 A1 19920603 - DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 184 (M - 1243) 6 May 1992 (1992-05-06)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955184 A2 19991110; EP 0955184 A3 20000503; EP 0955184 B1 20030827; DE 69910653 D1 20031002; DE 69910653 T2 20040624; JP H11321116 A 19991124

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69910653

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI