Global Patent Index - EP 0955257 A3

EP 0955257 A3 2000-05-31 - Method and device for feeding of sheet-like material

Title (en)

Method and device for feeding of sheet-like material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zuführen von bogenförmigem Material

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour alimenter des produits en feuilles

Publication

EP 0955257 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107318 A

Priority

DE 19819888 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955257A2] The friction between the sheet-form material(15) and feed path(1) is adjustable at least along one section of the feed path. The adjustment of the friction or friction coefficients is carried out by changing the material of the feed path coming into contact with the sheet-form material. This change may be carried out by producing a magnetic field in the feed path or by the blowing of an air jet into the feed path. The friction is adjustable depending upon predetermined data and/or process parameters. Both corner areas of the sheet-form material are elastically bent out from the plane of the material. An Independent claim is included for a device for reproducible feed of sheet-form material in which at least one of the slide rails(8) can be changed out to alter the friction against the sheet-form material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 9/10; B65H 9/14; B65H 29/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/10 (2006.01); B65H 9/14 (2006.01); B65H 29/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/70 (2013.01); B65H 9/103 (2013.01); B65H 9/108 (2013.01); B65H 9/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955257 A2 19991110; EP 0955257 A3 20000531; DE 19819888 A1 19991118; DE 19819888 B4 20040708

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031101

2001-04-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001130;LT PAYMENT 20001130;LV PAYMENT 20001130;MK PAYMENT 20001130;RO PAYMENT 20001130;SI PAYMENT 20001130

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI