Global Patent Index - EP 0955355 A3

EP 0955355 A3 2000-08-02 - Antioxidants for the stabilization of formulations comprising surfactants

Title (en)

Antioxidants for the stabilization of formulations comprising surfactants

Title (de)

Antioxidantien zur Stabilisierung tensidhaltiger Formulierungen

Title (fr)

Antioxydants pour stabiliser des formulations contenant des agents tensioactifs

Publication

EP 0955355 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99810327 A

Priority

  • EP 99810327 A
  • CH 214398 A
  • EP 98810374 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955355A2] The invention relates to cleaning compositions comprising (a1) a phenolic antioxidant of the formula (1) and/or (2); and/or (a2) an antioxidant of the formula (3); and (b) a surfactant comprising a long alkyl or alkenyl chain. The antioxidants used according to the invention have excellent reactivity, good stability to hydrolysis, particularly in an alkaline medium, and, because of their solubility, can be easily incorporated into the soap formulations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 9/04; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/26; C11D 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0084 (2013.01); C11D 3/2006 (2013.01); C11D 3/2034 (2013.01); C11D 3/2093 (2013.01); C11D 3/2096 (2013.01); C11D 3/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955355 A2 19991110; EP 0955355 A3 20000802

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020809

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020329

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI