Global Patent Index - EP 0955412 A3

EP 0955412 A3 2000-06-28 - Sectional modular elements for making non-permanent floors

Title (en)

Sectional modular elements for making non-permanent floors

Title (de)

Zusammensetzbare modulare Elemente für behelfsmässige Bodenbeläge

Title (fr)

Plancher non permanent composé d'éléments modulaires assemblés

Publication

EP 0955412 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99108399 A

Priority

IT VR980028 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955412A2] Modules for making provisional floors or platforms are based on a groove and tongue assembling arrangement that permits a longitudinal or transverse or mixed laying with an exact symmetry of the inserting points. In general, the present modules are obtained by molding plastic materials or the like and comprise a base element (1) which shows an essentially rectangular shape having a certain height and is hollow inside and open to the lower side. Grooves (2) are arranged two by two along the four perimetric edges. The grooves of two adjacent sides are flanged with particular tongue projections (3) which are arranged around the grooves like a flange. The tongue projections (3) mate with the grooves (2) of an adjacent module. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 5/20; E01C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/20 (2006.01); E01C 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 9/086 (2013.01); E01C 5/20 (2013.01); E01C 2201/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955412 A2 19991110; EP 0955412 A3 20000628; IT 245362 Y1 20020320; IT VR980028 U1 19991105

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030218

2001-03-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001228;LT PAYMENT 20001228;LV PAYMENT 20001228;MK PAYMENT 20001228;RO PAYMENT 20001228;SI PAYMENT 20001228

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI