Global Patent Index - EP 0955416 A3

EP 0955416 A3 2000-03-15 - Flushing mechanism for water-closets

Title (en)

Flushing mechanism for water-closets

Title (de)

Spülmechanismus für WC

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de chasse pour WC

Publication

EP 0955416 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105763 A

Priority

SE 9801358 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955416A2] Method and arrangement for regulating the emptying of a water closet. The closet comprises a tank (2), at least a manoeuvre mechanism (1), as well as a flushing outlet (3) in a lower portion of the tank (2). At the flushing outlet (3) is a bottom valve (4) as well as means for manoeuvring said valve (4) with the manoeuvre mechanism (1). There is also means for restoring the manoeuvre mechanism (1) into a starting position after a complete flushing. A plunge (6) in the manoeuvre mechanism (1) bear against a manoeuvre rod (8) actuateable by a release button (7), under the influence of a passive floater (F) arranged on a lifting peg (11) such as when the button (7) is actuated for achieving a flushing, the manoeuvre rod (8) is interlocked in a certain position. In this position a essentially vertical pressure is withheld agains a lever (9), which affects a lifting rod (10) of the bottom valve (4) in such a way, that the flushing water in the tank (2) is flushed. This may continue until the floater (F) loses its lifting power and consequently releases the pressure from the plunge (6) against the manoeuvre rod (8), so that the manoeuvre rod when a refill of the tank (2) is started, returns the manoeuvre rod (8) and its release button (7) to their respective starting positions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955416 A2 19991110; EP 0955416 A3 20000315; SE 509377 C2 19990118; SE 9801358 D0 19980420; SE 9801358 L 19990118

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030808

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030328

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE DK FI NL

2000-11-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000413;LV PAYMENT 20000413

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI NL

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI