Global Patent Index - EP 0955417 A3

EP 0955417 A3 2000-04-26 - Flushing device for a toilet flushing cistern

Title (en)

Flushing device for a toilet flushing cistern

Title (de)

Spüleinrichtung für einen WC-Spülkasten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chasse pour une chasse d'eau

Publication

EP 0955417 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108918 A

Priority

DE 29807875 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955417A2] A venting valve (13) positioned in the upper wall of a water vessel (7) Of a WC flushing system, is open in the inoperative position and comprises a venting aperture (8) and a two-armed pivoting lever (12), pivoting about a bearing (19). One arm of the lever has a valve flap (10) pointed towards the aperture and the other arm (9) is coupled with an operating member for releasing a smaller amount of flushing water. Another operating member releases a relatively large amount of water. The venting valve closes before the central drain valve (1) opens.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807875 U1 19980716; EP 0955417 A2 19991110; EP 0955417 A3 20000426; EP 0955417 B1 20031119; ES 2209273 T3 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59907766

- Representative's name: 24IP LAW GROUP SONNENBERG FORTMANN, DE

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-09-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209273 T3

2004-02-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907766 P 20031224

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALIAXIS PARTICIPATIONS

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETEX PLASTICS

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETEX SOCIETE ANONYME

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI