Global Patent Index - EP 0955423 A3

EP 0955423 A3 2000-05-31 - Cage former

Title (en)

Cage former

Title (de)

Element um einen Betonverstärkungskäfig zu bilden

Title (fr)

Elément pour former une cage de renforcement

Publication

EP 0955423 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99201368 A

Priority

  • GB 9809486 A
  • GB 9900766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955423A2] This invention relates to a cage former (14), and in particular to a cage former for use in assembling and maintaining a pile cage (10) for a reinforced concrete pile. According to one feature of the invention there is provided a cage former (14) having two frames (16) interconnected by a plurality of rods (18), the cage former having integral spacer means (22), characterised in that the spacer means is separate from each rod. Separating the spacer from the rod enables the number of spacers to be chosen separately from the number of rods which may be required. According to another feature of the invention, the spacer means (22) has an extended surface (30); this increases the surface area in engagement with the earth surrounding the pile in use, and reduces the likelihood that the spacer will dig into that earth and so mis-align the pile cage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/06; E04C 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/06 (2006.01); E04C 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/208 (2013.01); E04C 5/0604 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955423 A2 19991110; EP 0955423 A3 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21F 27/12 A, 7E 04C 5/06 B, 7E 04C 5/20 B, 7E 04C 5/16 B

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI