Global Patent Index - EP 0955428 A3

EP 0955428 A3 2000-10-04 - Set of elements for the construction of barriers, railings, guard rails or similar

Title (en)

Set of elements for the construction of barriers, railings, guard rails or similar

Title (de)

Elementensatz für den Bau von Barrieren, Geländern, Relingen oder ähnlichem

Title (fr)

"Ensemble d'éléments pour la constitution de barrières, garde-corps, rambardes ou similaires"

Publication

EP 0955428 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99420112 A

Priority

FR 9806049 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955428A2] The system consists of railing sections made from horizontal members and circular-section uprights, the sections being joined together end-to-end by connectors (3) with jaws (15) that can be tightened and slackened by nut and bolt assemblies (11). The connectors are fitted loosely to the adjacent end uprights of two railing sections, which can then be adjusted vertically or horizontally before the jaws are finally tightened.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/18 (2006.01); E04H 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/1842 (2013.01); E04H 17/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955428 A2 19991110; EP 0955428 A3 20001004; FR 2778421 A1 19991112

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-07-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04H 17/14 A

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI