Global Patent Index - EP 0955440 A3

EP 0955440 A3 2000-03-29 - Door frame system for use in dry interior construction work

Title (en)

Door frame system for use in dry interior construction work

Title (de)

Zargensystem für den trockenen Innenausbau

Title (fr)

Dormant pour l'aménagement intérieur à sec

Publication

EP 0955440 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890145 A

Priority

AT 74198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955440A2] The frame (1) in the rabbet area is screwed to the corresponding column through at least one plaster cardboard plate which is normally arranged to the wall plane. The frame consists of two parts pushed from the outside in the direction of the wall plane. By means of screws (4,6) the two parts are screwed to a profile (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955440 A2 19991110; EP 0955440 A3 20000329; CZ 9901605 A3 19991117; HU 9901492 A2 20010228; HU 9901492 A3 20010628; HU 9901492 D0 19990728; PL 332933 A1 19991108

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-01-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI