Global Patent Index - EP 0955465 A3

EP 0955465 A3 2000-08-16 - Axial piston pump with integrated system for measuring angular displacement

Title (en)

Axial piston pump with integrated system for measuring angular displacement

Title (de)

Axialkolbenpumpe mit integriertem Schwenkwegmesssystem

Title (fr)

Pompe à piston axiale avec système intégral de mesure de déplacement angulaire

Publication

EP 0955465 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104637 A

Priority

DE 19819960 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955465A2] The pump has a non-contact displacement measuring system (40-44), arranged between the housing (11,12) and the swash plate (33) for adjusting the volume flow or the swivellable rotor. The measuring system includes respectively at least one sensor element (44) and at least one element (41) indicating the displacement measuring. The element (41) represents the measurement path or the sensor element (44) is arranged at the swash plate. The element (41) representing the measurement path or the sensor element is arranged at a cam plate connected to the rotor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/00; F01B 3/10; F04B 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/26 (2006.01); F04B 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/002 (2013.01); F04B 2201/12051 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955465 A2 19991110; EP 0955465 A3 20000816; DE 19819960 A1 19991118; DE 19819960 B4 20050303; JP H11336656 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 49/00 A, 7F 04B 1/32 B, 7F 01B 3/10 B

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI