Global patent index - EP 0955499 A3

EP 0955499 A3 2000-02-02 - Process for regulating the firing power in combustion plants

Title (en)

Process for regulating the firing power in combustion plants

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Regeln der Feuerleistung von Verbrennungsanlagen

Title (fr)

Procédé de régulation de la puissance de combustion dans les installations de combustion

Publication

EP 0955499 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108274 A

Priority

DE 19820038 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955499A2] The method for controlling a burning systems fire power involves controlled raking and shredding of the material to be burnt. The method involves outputting the material to be burned at the start of a firing grill (1). On this grill, the material is shredded and raked and conveyed. At the end of the grill the resulting slag is taken away. The raking and conveying of the material is affected in dependence on how much the grill and burning bed allows the passage of combustion air through. The system has a measuring apparatus with a temperature probe (17), a pressure detector (19) and an air supply line with a flow meter (18). The measurement values are used to generate a control signal to affect the raking speed of the grill, the amount of fuel output, the amount of slag carried away and the amount of air supplied.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/08 (2006.01); F23B 90/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/50 (2006.01); F23N 1/02 (2006.01); F23N 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/50 (2013.01); F23N 1/022 (2013.01); F23G 2207/101 (2013.01); F23G 2207/102 (2013.01); F23G 2207/113 (2013.01); F23G 2207/20 (2013.01); F23G 2207/30 (2013.01); F23G 2900/55009 (2013.01); F23N 2005/181 (2013.01); F23N 2025/04 (2013.01); F23N 2025/13 (2013.01); F23N 2035/06 (2013.01); F23N 2041/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5398623 A 19950321 - LAUTENSCHLAGER GERT [DE], et al
  • [A] EP 0539309 A1 19930428 - PILLARD CHAUFFAGE [FR]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 004, no. 041 (M - 005) 29 March 1980 (1980-03-29)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 258 (M - 340) 27 November 1984 (1984-11-27)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 549 (M - 1338) 18 November 1992 (1992-11-18)
  • [A] ALBERT VON F A ET AL: "PRIMARMASSNAHMEN ZUR MINDERUNG VON EMISSIONEN BEI DER ABFALLVERBRENNUNG", VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK,DE,VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK GMBH. ESSEN, vol. 76, no. 8, pages 635-642, XP000623076, ISSN: 0372-5715

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955499 A2 19991110; EP 0955499 A3 20000202; EP 0955499 B1 20030903; AT 249010 T 20030915; BR 9901450 A 20000516; CA 2270812 A1 19991105; CA 2270812 C 20040706; CZ 292765 B6 20031217; CZ 9901592 A3 19991215; DE 19820038 A1 19991125; DE 19820038 C2 20000323; DK 0955499 T3 20031208; ES 2207056 T3 20040516; JP 3135892 B2 20010219; JP H11337035 A 19991210; NO 318539 B1 20050411; NO 992142 A 19991108; NO 992142 D0 19990503; PL 332931 A1 19991108; PT 955499 E 20040130; RU 2155911 C1 20000910; SG 84529 A1 20011120; TW 460676 B 20011021; US 6145453 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2207056

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031118

2003-12-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-11-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906821

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011113

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-02-23 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBC

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI