Global Patent Index - EP 0955590 A4

EP 0955590 A4 2001-12-05 - Data interface and high-speed communication using the same

Title (en)

Data interface and high-speed communication using the same

Title (de)

Datenschnittstelle und Hochgeschwindigkeitskommunikation mit dieser Schnittstelle

Title (fr)

Interface de données et communication à haute vitesse utilisant le même interface

Publication

EP 0955590 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97954866 A

Priority

JP 9703898 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922307A1] A data interface for transferring data between processors which is formed of write registers (12) in which the data from a data sending write processor are written in accordance with a clock signal, read registers (13) in which the data written in these write registers are transferred by a later clock action and written, and from which the data are read out by a data receiving read processor, a write control means (15, 14-1 to 14-n) for writing data selectively in a register among the write registers in accordance with an address signal and a write signal from the write processor, and a read control means (16, 17) for reading data selectively from a register among the read registers in accordance with an address signal from the read processor. Owing to a double buffer structure in the write registers and read registers, address and data signals are connected separately on the write side and read side, so that the transfer of data can be carried out with the processors not interfering with each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 15/163; G06F 13/38; G06F 13/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/40 (2006.01); G06F 13/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/4217 (2013.01); G06F 13/405 (2013.01); G06F 13/4243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922307 A1 19990506; DE 69721825 D1 20030612; DE 69721825 T2 20040408; EP 0955590 A1 19991110; EP 0955590 A4 20011205; EP 0955590 B1 20030507; JP 3797491 B2 20060719; TW 360837 B 19990611; US 6357015 B1 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69721825

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071027

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071027

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071027

2006-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061015

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-13 [REG GB 727H] SPECIFICATION AMENDED (SECT. 27/1977)

2005-03-16 [REG GB 727A] APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION NOW OPEN TO OPPOSITION (SECT. 27/1977)

2004-10-27 [REG GB 727] APPLICATION MADE FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION (SECT. 27/1977)

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69721825 P 20030612

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB NL

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DATA INTERFACE AND HIGH-SPEED COMMUNICATION USING THE SAME

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020403

2001-12-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB NL

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 15/163 A, 7G 06F 13/38 B, 7G 06F 13/42 B

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990629

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB NL