Global Patent Index - EP 0955661 A3

EP 0955661 A3 2000-09-06 - Circuit breaker for control transformers and circuit arrangement therefor

Title (en)

Circuit breaker for control transformers and circuit arrangement therefor

Title (de)

Schutzschalter für Steuertransformatoren und Schaltungsanordnung hierzu

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur pour transformateurs de commande et agencement de circuit y associé

Publication

EP 0955661 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108953 A

Priority

DE 29808372 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0955661A2] The control transformer is operated with a 3 pole switch (1a) that has contact sets (14-16) for each contact path (11-13). The contacts are operated by an actuator (10) that connects with a thermal release (17) and a magnetic short circuit trigger (18). The thermal device consists of bimetallic elements (171,173).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 83/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[AD] DE 4133475 A1 19920416 - TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0955661 A2 19991110; EP 0955661 A3 20000906; DE 29808372 U1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-27 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2001-06-27 [DBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (DELETED)

2001-06-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010405

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

1999-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI