Global Patent Index - EP 0955817 B1

EP 0955817 B1 2001-12-05 - NECKTIE

Title (en)

NECKTIE

Title (de)

KRAWATTE

Title (fr)

CRAVATE

Publication

EP 0955817 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98906816 A

Priority

  • DE 9800140 W
  • DE 29701526 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2279227A1] The invention relates to a tie made of leather, textiles or pliable material with a collar for fastening the tie to the neck and a front apron fitted to the collar, whereby the front apron (5) is formed by at least intertwined three bands (2, 3, 4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 25/02; A41D 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 25/00 (2006.01); A41D 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 25/00 (2013.01); A41D 25/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29701526 U1 19970417; CA 2279227 A1 19980806; CA 2279227 C 20071009; CN 1173651 C 20041103; CN 1246037 A 20000301; EP 0955817 A1 19991117; EP 0955817 B1 20011205; ES 2167871 T3 20020516; WO 9833405 A1 19980806

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180115

2018-02-07 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180115

2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-17 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20180115

2018-01-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59802324

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167871 T3

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802324 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010201

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990727

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL