Global patent index - EP 0955871 A4

EP 0955871 A4 2000-03-22 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NONINVASIVELY DETERMINING HEMATOCRIT

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NONINVASIVELY DETERMINING HEMATOCRIT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG FÜR INHALATORS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETERMINATION NON INVASIVE DE L'HEMATOCRITE

Publication

EP 0955871 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96910716 A

Priority

  • US 9604547 W
  • US 42540495 A
  • US 48449095 A
  • US 60270096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9632883A1] This invention is a method and apparatus for non-invasiveness in determining hematocrit, utilizing the frequency dependent electrical impedance characteristics of whole blood by electrically stimulating a patient body portion containing a vascular compartment with a current source over a range of frequencies. A hematocrit measurement system includes a signal generator and demodulator [SGD] (34) that sends an applied signal to an electrode pod (36) that applies a current to a limb of a patient. The electrode pod (36) receives resulting measured voltage signals and provides them to the SGD. The SGD provides to a personal computer [PC] (42) signals indicative of the current passing through the limb of the patient and the resulting voltage. The voltage and current may be measured for various frequencies over, for example, a range from about 10 kHz to about 10 MHz. The electrical impedance from the blood alone is isolated from the total limb impedance from the blood, tissue, bone, etc. by determining the difference between measurement at different blood volumes. The hematocrit is determined by the PC based on inphase and quadrature data provided by the SGD. A neural network (52) may be useful in determining the hematocrit from the blood impedance patterns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/02; A61B 5/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/022 (2006.01); A61B 5/145 (2006.01); G01N 27/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/487 (2006.01); G01N 33/49 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/49 (2013.01); A61B 5/14535 (2013.01); A61B 5/4869 (2013.01); A61B 5/7264 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9632883 A1 19961024; AU 5383796 A 19961107; CA 2218281 A1 19961024; CA 2218281 C 20040817; CN 1244779 A 20000216; EP 0955871 A1 19991117; EP 0955871 A4 20000322; JP 2001500392 A 20010116; JP 3844779 B2 20061115

INPADOC legal status

2013-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20121101

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030130

2000-03-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000204

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6A 61B 5/02 A, 6A 61B 5/05 B

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980219

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT