Global Patent Index - EP 0956083 A4

EP 0956083 A4 2000-07-05 - NON-INVASIVE IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

NON-INVASIVE IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

NICHT-INVASIVE IDENTIFIKATIONSANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF NON INVASIF D'IDENTIFICATION

Publication

EP 0956083 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96940090 A

Priority

  • IB 9601440 W
  • US 55884095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9718009A1] A system and a kit for the non-invasive collection of DNA material from the inner cheeks of a living person or corpse. Included are swabs of high modulus fibers which scrape DNA material from the inner cheeks to obtain sufficient material for future identification.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 10/00 (2006.01); A61B 10/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/483 (2006.01); A61B 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 10/02 (2013.01); A61B 10/0051 (2013.01); A61B 10/0096 (2013.01); A61B 2017/320012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9403111 A1 19940217 - GENZYME CORP [US]
  • [A] WO 9519447 A1 19950720 - JOCKEY CLUB [US]
  • [A] GB 2289266 A 19951115 - GD SPA [IT]
  • [X] RICHARDS B ET AL: "MULTIPLEX PCR AMPLIFICATION FROM THE CFTR GENE USING DNA PREPARED FROM BUCCAL BRUSHES/SWABS", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, vol. 2, no. 2, 1 February 1993 (1993-02-01), pages 159 - 163, XP000673447, ISSN: 0964-6906
  • See also references of WO 9718009A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9718009 A1 19970522; CA 2251785 A1 19970522; EP 0956083 A1 19991117; EP 0956083 A4 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2000-07-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981014

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE