Global Patent Index - EP 0956171 B1

EP 0956171 B1 2001-03-21 - VESSEL FOR METALLURGICAL PURPOSES

Title (en)

VESSEL FOR METALLURGICAL PURPOSES

Title (de)

GEFÄSS FÜR METALLURGISCHE ZWECKE

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT METALLURGIQUE

Publication

EP 0956171 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96945810 A

Priority

  • DE 9601906 W
  • DE 19538530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19538530C1] A metallurgical vessel for carrying molten metals has a metallic casing made of individual shell rings which hold the refractory lining. The metallic casing has two circumferential reinforcing rings and two vessel-carrying journals arranged opposite each other at the outer side of the metallic casing and supported each by a plate joined to the reinforcing ring. In order to ensure that such a vessel is uniformly stressed when subjected to both loads and heat and withstands a characteristic temperature of up to 400 DEG C, and that the loops for the crane hooks remain vertical in all operating conditions, the reinforcing rings (6-8) form an integral part of the metallic casing (3-5) and the central area of the plate (10, 10') is located at a short distance from the metallic casing. The top and bottom rim-like edges (11, 12) of the plate (10, 10') are joined to the adjacent reinforcing rings (6, 7), preferably by welding, and the vessel-carrying journal (9, 9') extends only outwards from the plate (10, 10'). Depending on the size of the vessel (1) in the axial direction, more than two reinforcing rings (6-8) may be provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/00; B22D 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19538530 C1 19961219; DE 19538530 C5 20040219; AT 199847 T 20010415; EP 0956171 A2 19991117; EP 0956171 B1 20010321; KR 100437879 B1 20040908; US 6036916 A 20000314; WO 9713598 A2 19970417; WO 9713598 A3 19970814

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 199847 T

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-10-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160930

2016-10-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606651

2016-07-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ASKU-SCHOLTEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANNESMANNROEHREN-WERKE AG, 45473 MUELHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 59606651

2016-07-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606651

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2004-10-07 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041007

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606651 20010426

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199847 T 20010415

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000202

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980312

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL