Global Patent Index - EP 0956173 B1

EP 0956173 B1 2001-02-28 - METAL POWDER GRANULATES, METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE OF THE SAME

Title (en)

METAL POWDER GRANULATES, METHOD FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE OF THE SAME

Title (de)

METALLPULVER-GRANULAT, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE DESSEN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

GRANULES DE POUDRE METALLIQUE, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0956173 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96939034 A

Priority

  • DE 19544107 A
  • EP 9604983 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19544107C1] The invention concerns metal powder granulates comprising one or a plurality of the metals Co, Cu, Ni, W and Mo. The invention further concerns a method for the production of these granulates and the use thereof. The production method is characterized in that a metal compound comprising one or a plurality of the groups comprising oxides, hydroxides, carbonates, hydrogenocarbonates, oxalates, acetates, formiates with binder and optionally in addition between 40 and 80 % solvent, relative to the solids content, is granulated as the starting component, and the granulates are thermally reduced in a hydrogen-containing gaseous atmosphere to form the metal powder granulates, the binder and the solvent, if used, being removed completely.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 9/22; B22F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 9/22 (2006.01); B27G 19/00 (2006.01); C22C 19/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 9/22 (2013.01); B22F 1/0096 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 9/026 + B22F 9/22
  2. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 1/0096 + B22F 9/026

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19544107 C1 19970430; AT 199340 T 20010315; AU 702983 B2 19990311; AU 7683896 A 19970619; CA 2238281 A1 19970605; CA 2238281 C 20060411; CN 1090068 C 20020904; CN 1202846 A 19981223; DE 59606529 D1 20010405; EP 0956173 A1 19991117; EP 0956173 B1 20010228; ES 2155209 T3 20010501; HK 1017630 A1 20030502; JP 2000500826 A 20000125; JP 2008285759 A 20081127; JP 4240534 B2 20090318; KR 100439361 B1 20040716; PT 956173 E 20010830; US 6126712 A 20001003; WO 9719777 A1 19970605

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141115

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141114

2015-12-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151229

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141114

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141114

2015-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150514

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 199340 T

- Effective date: 20141114

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606529

2015-05-21 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150514

2014-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131011

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20131112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130514

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155209 T3

2001-04-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606529 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR IT PT

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199340 T 20010315

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000714

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980629

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR IT PT