Global Patent Index - EP 0956417 B1

EP 0956417 B1 2001-03-21 - CABLE-CONTROLLED WINDOW WINDER WITH A GUIDING TRACK

Title (en)

CABLE-CONTROLLED WINDOW WINDER WITH A GUIDING TRACK

Title (de)

SEILFENSTERHEBER MIT EINER FÜHRUNGSSCHIENE

Title (fr)

LEVE-VITRE A CABLE POURVU D'UN RAIL

Publication

EP 0956417 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97954720 A

Priority

  • DE 9703035 W
  • DE 19654851 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19654851C1] The invention relates to a cable-controlled window winder, particularly for motor vehicles, comprising a guiding track (10), a catch (20) for a window pane which is positioned movably against the guiding track, and a cable loop (1) that is firmly attached to the catch, connected to a drive unit and guided along the guiding track by reversing elements. According to the invention, the locking element is the base component of the catch (20) positioned movably against the guiding track, said base component of the catch (20) has a supporting area (23), preferably a supporting edge, which by swivelling the catch (20) can be brought into a positive fit with a supporting element (30) provided for along the guiding track (10). In addition, the supporting area (23) of the catch (20) assigned to the supporting element (30) is at a distance from the axis of traction of the cable loop, the supporting element (30) is positioned below the friction element (29) and the window pane (7) is articulated with the catch (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/50; E05F 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 1/17 (2006.01); E05F 11/48 (2006.01); E05F 11/50 (2006.01); E05F 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/483 (2013.01); E05F 11/488 (2013.01); E05F 11/505 (2013.01); E05F 11/385 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19654851 C1 19980610; BR 9714114 A 20000321; EP 0956417 A1 19991117; EP 0956417 B1 20010321; ES 2156415 T3 20010616; JP 2001507418 A 20010605; JP 3514261 B2 20040331; US 6050029 A 20000418; WO 9829632 A1 19980709

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59703203

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101231

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051224

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-12-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2005-12-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-12-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-12-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041224

2004-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031204

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROVVISIONATO & CO. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156415

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703203

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000615

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990611

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE