Global Patent Index - EP 0956424 B1

EP 0956424 B1 2001-01-24 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRIVING BORE HOLES, SPECIALLY EXPLORING AND EXTRACTION DRILLINGS IN THE SEA BOTTOM

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRIVING BORE HOLES, SPECIALLY EXPLORING AND EXTRACTION DRILLINGS IN THE SEA BOTTOM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM NIEDERBRINGEN VON BOHRLÖCHERN IN DEN MEERESBODEN DURCH ANWENDUNG EINES GEGENSPÜLVERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FONCER DES FORAGES, EN PARTICULIER DES FORAGES D'EXPLORATION ET D'EXPLOITATION DANS LE FOND DE LA MER

Publication

EP 0956424 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951814 A

Priority

  • DE 9702770 W
  • DE 19651303 A
  • DE 19702984 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9826151A2] The invention relates to a method and a device for driving bore holes, specially exploring and extraction drillings in the sea bottom (40). According to the invention, the sea bottom is slackened by means of a rotating drilling head (10) which is fitted to the lower end of a drill string (5) designed for transmitting torque. The upper end of the drill string is mounted on a floating platform (1), wherein the drill string (5) is composed of at least two telescopically interfitting string parts (6, 7), which during a vertical movement of the platform, e.g. a movement induced by the sea swell, exert a relative movement with respect to each other so that the drilling head (10) rests with a substantially constant force on the surface to be cleared away.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/128

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/124 (2006.01); E21B 7/128 (2006.01); E21B 17/07 (2006.01); E21B 19/08 (2006.01); E21B 19/09 (2006.01); E21B 21/00 (2006.01); E21B 21/14 (2006.01); E21B 43/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/09 (2013.01); E21B 7/124 (2013.01); E21B 7/128 (2013.01); E21B 17/07 (2013.01); E21B 19/08 (2013.01); E21B 21/001 (2013.01); E21B 21/14 (2013.01); E21B 43/29 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9826151 A2 19980618; WO 9826151 A3 19981001; AU 5548398 A 19980703; AU 730041 B2 20010222; EP 0956424 A2 19991117; EP 0956424 B1 20010124; US 6422324 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131127

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131127

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB

2000-06-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000420

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): GB