Global Patent Index - EP 0956476 B1

EP 0956476 B1 2002-11-13 - ANCHORAGE OF LAMINAR FLAME OF FUEL-GAS

Title (en)

ANCHORAGE OF LAMINAR FLAME OF FUEL-GAS

Title (de)

VERANKERUNG EINER LAMINAREN GASFLAMME

Title (fr)

ANCRAGE D'UNE FALMME LAMINAIRE DE COMBUSTIBLE GAZEUX

Publication

EP 0956476 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97954925 A

Priority

  • EP 9707119 W
  • IT MI962653 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9827386A1] The aim of this invention is to provide a method and apparatuses to make possible the proper combustion in very compact combustion systems in all operating conditions connected with the capacity modulation or/and the use of limit gases. This aim is reached by applying the method so that, in a combustion system, a premixed, atmospheric or forced burner form the fuel-gas air mixture, from almost stoichiometric to strongly hyperstoichiometric, which outflows from at least one flame opening (7) with velocity and modalities such as to obtain a substantially laminar flow and average velocity in all operating higher than the combustion velocity of the mixture in said condition, at least for a distance equal to that of at least one fluids dynamic obstacle (12) which is immerged in said jet, down stream the flame opening/s (7). Said obstacle (12) is always completely detached from said opening/s (7), having such shape and dimensions to create down stream a stagnation zone, anchorage of the flame (19) in all operating conditions. The flow field down stream and on the side of the obstacle (12) is almost laminar with progressively slightly divergent fluids threads, to obtain a flame (19), from laminar to wrinkled, at the beginning ignited from a specific device, characterised by a large surface and very low thickness anchored to the obstacle (12) at least in some points.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/70; F23D 14/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/10 (2006.01); F23D 14/58 (2006.01); F23D 14/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/58 (2013.01); F23D 14/105 (2013.01); F23D 14/70 (2013.01); F23D 2209/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9827386 A1 19980625; DE 69717152 D1 20021219; EP 0956476 A1 19991117; EP 0956476 B1 20021113; IT 1289459 B1 19981015; IT MI962653 A1 19980618; IT MI962653 D0 19961218

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-10-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030214

2003-02-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717152 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000315

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990622

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL