Global Patent Index - EP 0956576 B1

EP 0956576 B1 2001-05-16 - SWITCHING DEVICE WITH TRIPPED POSITION OF THE LATCHING MECHANISM

Title (en)

SWITCHING DEVICE WITH TRIPPED POSITION OF THE LATCHING MECHANISM

Title (de)

SCHALTGERÄT MIT TRIPPED-STELLUNG DES SCHALTSCHLOSSES

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION AVEC POSITION DE DECLENCHEMENT DU MECANISME DE VERROUILLAGE

Publication

EP 0956576 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98907845 A

Priority

  • DE 9800183 W
  • DE 19703959 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19703959C1] A switching device including a latching or breaker mechanism, including a switch lever (8) a pawl (7) and a latch (6) as a counter-bearing for the pawl which rotates at release (triggering) about its bearing axis and releases the switch lever (8) for actuating the contacts. A detent (10) is provided in the latching mechanism (1) and allows the pawl (7) at release or triggering to swing through but prevents it swinging back again, thus fixing the pawl (7) in a given position in which the handle (14) is held in an intermediate position between the ON-and OUT-position of the switching device, on account of the linkage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/12 (2006.01); H01H 71/04 (2006.01); H01H 71/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/56 (2013.01); H01H 71/04 (2013.01); H01H 2071/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19703959 C1 19980423; CN 1205638 C 20050608; CN 1369103 A 20020911; EP 0956576 A2 19991117; EP 0956576 B1 20010516; JP 2001513249 A 20010828; WO 9834256 A2 19980806; WO 9834256 A3 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-01-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000915

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990720

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR IT