Global Patent Index - EP 0956789 A3

EP 0956789 A3 2000-02-23 - Transpiring shoe structure

Title (en)

Transpiring shoe structure

Title (de)

Dampfdurchlässiges Schuhwerk

Title (fr)

Chaussure perméable à la vapeur

Publication

EP 0956789 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99102897 A

Priority

IT MI980333 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0956789A2] A transpiring shoe structure comprising an upper (9), a sole (3) provided with a plurality of through holes (5) across its thickness and a water-repellent and transpiring insole (7) attached above said sole (3) or a bag upper (99, 999) again with an insole (77, 777) formed by a water-repellent and transpiring membrane again attached above said perforated sole (33, 333). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 7/08; A43B 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/08 (2006.01); A43B 7/12 (2006.01); A43B 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/125 (2013.01); A43B 7/087 (2013.01); A43B 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0956789 A2 19991117; EP 0956789 A3 20000223; IT MI980333 U1 19991115; JP 2000023703 A 20000125

INPADOC legal status


2001-04-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010215

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEFCOM S.P.A.

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERTILACCHI MARIELLA

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI