Global Patent Index - EP 0956790 A3

EP 0956790 A3 2002-11-27 - Umbrella stand

Title (en)

Umbrella stand

Title (de)

Schirmständer

Title (fr)

Support pour parapluie

Publication

EP 0956790 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108011 A

Priority

DE 29808843 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0956790A2] The stand ha a support element designed to resist the overturning moment of an umbrella, and holder elements for receiving the umbrellas. The stand element and holder elements are connected together via a pivot axis and restricted in relative angular movement by a stop. The pivot axis is located close to the ground.The support element consists of a spike with a tube opening in the upwards direction, whereby the spike is designed to be inserted into the ground. The pipe is inserted into the upper end of the spike, and is secured against relative rotation via a grub screw.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 17/00; A45B 25/00; E04H 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 17/00 (2006.01); E04H 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 17/00 (2013.01); E04H 12/2215 (2013.01); E04H 12/2284 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29808843 U1 19980917; EP 0956790 A2 19991117; EP 0956790 A3 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040702

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 45B 17/00 A, 7A 45B 25/00 B, 7E 04H 12/22 B

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990520

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI