Global Patent Index - EP 0956792 A3

EP 0956792 A3 2001-02-07 - A support for oscillating or synchronized chair

Title (en)

A support for oscillating or synchronized chair

Title (de)

Stütze für einen schwingenden oder synchronisierten Stuhl

Title (fr)

Support pour une chaise oscillante ou synchronisée

Publication

EP 0956792 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99107347 A

Priority

IT MI980895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0956792A2] A support for oscillating and inclinable chairs, comprising a device for stop the same inatilted position, comprising at least two toothed racks (10, 11) with staggered teeth, placed side by side and adapted to selectively engage a stop pivot (9); the distance between the teeth (12) of the racks placed side by side (10, 11) is equal to P/ n, where P is the pitch of the teeth of each rack and n is the number of racks placed side by side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/026; A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03294 (2013.01); A47C 1/03238 (2013.01); A47C 1/03255 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0956792 A2 19991117; EP 0956792 A3 20010207; IT 1306231 B1 20010604; IT MI980895 A1 19991027

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI