Global patent index - EP 0956793 A3

EP 0956793 A3 2001-01-17 - A tiltable support for chair

Title (en)

A tiltable support for chair

Title (de)

Verschwenkbare Stütze für einen Stuhl

Title (fr)

Support basculant pour chaise

Publication

EP 0956793 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99107348 A

Priority

IT MI980894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0956793A2] An inclinable support for chairs, oscillating or synchronized armchairs and similar furniture has a device of regulation of the suspension and of the seat inclination, by means of setting an inclination spring (8), that comprises: at least one inclined surface (14) between a fixed part (13) and a mobile part (10) in contact with the extremity of the said spring; at least one wedge (12) interposed between the fixed part and the mobile part with at least one inclined surface (15) complementary to and matching the inclined surface (14); and means for moving said wedge to cause said fixed and mobile parts to separate or come together. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 3/026; A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03294 (2013.01); A47C 1/03255 (2013.01); A47C 1/03266 (2013.01); A47C 1/03272 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0956793 A2 19991117; EP 0956793 A3 20010117; IT 1306230 B1 20010604; IT MI980894 A1 19991027; US 2001013569 A1 20010816

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI