Global patent index - EP 0956798 A3

EP 0956798 A3 2000-08-16 - Closure device

Title (en)

Closure device

Title (de)

Schliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fermeture

Publication

EP 0956798 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99303813 A

Priority

GB 9810345 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0956798A2] A closure device for a door (2) which abuts against a door frame (3), in particular for a walk-in bath (1), the device comprising a base member (7) for placement on one face of the door (2), a bar (9) supported substantially at its centre to rotate relative to the base member (7), and a pair of wedges (10,11) mounted adjacent either side of the door frame (3), whereby, when the door (2) is generally closed, rotation of the bar (9) causes the end of the bar (9) to engage with said wedges (10,11) thus abutting the door (2) firmly against the frame (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/022; A47K 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0956798 A2 19991117; EP 0956798 A3 20000816; GB 2337290 A 19991117; GB 2337290 B 20011205; GB 9810345 D0 19980715

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010217

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47K 3/022 A, 7A 47K 3/00 B

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI