Global patent index - EP 0956799 A3

EP 0956799 A3 2000-09-13 - Shower partition

Title (en)

Shower partition

Title (de)

Duschabtrennung

Title (fr)

Cloison pour douches

Publication

EP 0956799 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107896 A

Priority

DE 19821339 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0956799A2] The guide rail (6) has a guide groove (31) for support rollers (10) and a further guide groove (30) for a guide roller (11). The guide roller and support roller are connected together by a yoke (12). The rollers are connected on the inside of the partition to the sliding panels (2) by a suspension yoke (8). The fixed side parts (1) of the shower are fixed on the guide rail with mountings (7) which engage round from the inside of the shower partition. The mountings can be aligned by adjusting screws (21, 23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/22; A47K 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/34 (2006.01); E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E06B 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/34 (2013.01); E05D 15/063 (2013.01); E05D 15/0652 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/614 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/684 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/688 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/16 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/28 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/672 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/114 (2013.01); E06B 3/4681 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0956799 A2 19991117; EP 0956799 A3 20000913; EP 0956799 B1 20040804; AT 272349 T 20040815; DE 19821339 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060421

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2005-06-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PAUL-JEAN MUNCH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2005-05-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUNCH, PAUL-JEAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-04-20 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: MUNCH, PAUL-JEAN

2005-03-30 [DIN2] INVENTOR (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: DIN2

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 47K 3/34 A

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47K 3/22 A, 7A 47K 3/34 B

2000-02-04 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI