Global Patent Index - EP 0956888 A3

EP 0956888 A3 2000-06-28 - Modular symmetrical body

Title (en)

Modular symmetrical body

Title (de)

Zusammensetzbarer symmetrischer Körper

Title (fr)

Corps symétrique modulaire

Publication

EP 0956888 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810368 A

Priority

CH 108098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0956888A2] The geometrical body has a number of axes of symmetry and consists of a central body and a group of congruent bodies. These are a number of outer components (9) which are limited by a base area (10), a surface area (11) as well as by a number of flat surfaces (12,16). The base area of each component is adjacent and connected to a corresponding and congruent area of the central body. All the outer components are rigidly connected to the central body by a connection which can be dismantled and reassembled by the application of a relatively small force. In the assembled state, all the congruent outer bodies lie next to each other so that there is no space between their adjacent flat surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/12 (2006.01); A63H 33/00 (2006.01); A63H 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/08 (2013.01); A63F 9/1208 (2013.01); A63F 2009/124 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29809820 U1 19980813; EP 0956888 A2 19991117; EP 0956888 A3 20000628; JP 3382883 B2 20030304; JP H11342276 A 19991214; US 6116979 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050621

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031219

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI