Global Patent Index - EP 0956897 A3

EP 0956897 A3 2000-12-06 - Apparatus for mixing a gas flowing through a conduit

Title (en)

Apparatus for mixing a gas flowing through a conduit

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Durchmischung eines einen Kanal durchströmenden Gases

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour mélanger un gaz passant un conduit

Publication

EP 0956897 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108479 A

Priority

DE 19820992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0956897A2] Gases flowing through a passage are mixed by the action of an arrow-shaped vortex generator (1), the cross-section of which is a flat W or omega . The arrow rests with the tip inclined down towards the oncoming first gas which swirls around the leading edges into a concave mixing zone at the rear, into which a secondary substance, especially a reduction agent, is released. The lower face of the vortex generator has a V-shaped locating recess (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/06; B01F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/00 (2006.01); B01F 3/02 (2006.01); B01F 5/04 (2006.01); B01F 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/0451 (2013.01); B01F 5/0616 (2013.01); B01F 2005/0628 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0956897 A2 19991117; EP 0956897 A3 20001206; DE 19820992 A1 19991118; DE 19820992 C2 20030109; JP 2000061283 A 20000229; KR 19990088142 A 19991227; PL 333040 A1 19991122; TW 499321 B 20020821; US 6135629 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BBP ENVIRONMENT GMBH

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI