Global Patent Index - EP 0956929 B2

EP 0956929 B2 2009-02-18 - Apparatus for cutting a product in wedge-like pieces

Title (en)

Apparatus for cutting a product in wedge-like pieces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zerschneiden eines Gegenstandes in keilförmige Stücke

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la coupe d'un produit en morceaux cunéiformes

Publication

EP 0956929 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 99104896 A

Priority

DE 19821753 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0956929A2] The device has a cutter element (19), moved by a drive to execute a cutting movement within a cutting plane, which is mainly at right angles to the surface supporting the cheese. A transporter element (13) generates a relative movement in transport direction (A) between cheese and cutter element. The cutting plane of the cutter element is pivoted about an axis (21), which is at right angles to the support surface. The cutter element is moved by an actuator with esp. a hydraulic or pneumatic cylinder, lever, mechanical cam drive, and/or servo drive.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/24 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0956929 A2 19991117; EP 0956929 A3 20020522; EP 0956929 B1 20040707; EP 0956929 B2 20090218; AT 270606 T 20040715; DE 19821753 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130311

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130311

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909884

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 270606 T

- Effective date: 20130311

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120329

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2009-05-06 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-02-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DOEINGHAUS MASCHINENBAU GMBH

2005-06-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DOEINGHAUS MASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-06-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DOEINGHAUS MASCHINENBAU GMBH

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909884 P 20040812

2004-08-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-03-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020626

2003-03-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI