Global Patent Index - EP 0956935 B1

EP 0956935 B1 2003-06-04 - Knife ring cutter

Title (en)

Knife ring cutter

Title (de)

Messerringzerspaner

Title (fr)

Déchiqueteuse à lames-couronne

Publication

EP 0956935 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102075 A

Priority

DE 19819125 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19819125C1] The tool has a knife ring (2), partially located inside a housing (30), which has a door (30.4) for a rotor (20). Wearing sealing rings are located in the areas of rotor end walls (20.2,20.3) and associated knife ring carrier rings (2.1,2.2). One sealing ring (50) is fastened to the housing door. The sealing ring (40) in the rear wall area (30.1) is fastened directly or indirectly to the rear wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23C 3/00 (2006.01); B27L 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/02 (2013.01); Y10T 83/9464 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19819125 C1 19990527; BR 9901318 A 20000321; CA 2270673 A1 19991029; CA 2270673 C 20080715; CN 1089055 C 20020814; CN 1234321 A 19991110; EP 0956935 A2 19991117; EP 0956935 A3 20000426; EP 0956935 B1 20030604; ES 2200414 T3 20040301; JP H11347821 A 19991221; KR 100569666 B1 20060410; KR 19990083533 A 19991125; PL 189742 B1 20050930; PL 332795 A1 19991108; US 6202720 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-18 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20110623

2011-06-23 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2011-03-02 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20101025

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: B. *MAIER ZERKLEINERUNGSTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100228

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090302

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KLOECKNER WOOD TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200414 T3

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI