Global Patent Index - EP 0956973 A3

EP 0956973 A3 2000-02-23 - Blanket for printing with full transfer of the ink

Title (en)

Blanket for printing with full transfer of the ink

Title (de)

Vollständig druckendes Gummituch

Title (fr)

Blanchet pour l'impression avec transfert complet de l'encre

Publication

EP 0956973 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107377 A

Priority

US 8007398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0956973A2] The rubber offset covering (21) has a surface layer of material with little polar surface energy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/02 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01); B41F 13/44 (2006.01); B41N 10/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/44 (2013.01); B41N 10/02 (2013.01); B41N 2210/02 (2013.01); B41N 2210/04 (2013.01); B41N 2210/06 (2013.01); B41N 2210/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 4178850 A 19791218 - HELMIG RICHARD W [US]
  • [XA] GB 1390833 A 19750416 - RICOH KK
  • [X] WO 9111330 A1 19910808 - REEVES SPA [IT]
  • [A] US 5351616 A 19941004 - GELINAS W ROBERT [US], et al
  • [A] US 5294481 A 19940315 - NAKAMURA TAKATO [JP], et al
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 103 (M - 1221) 13 March 1992 (1992-03-13)
  • [L] EDITED BY JAMES F. CARLEY: "Whittington's Dictionary of Plastics.", 1993, TECHNOMIC PUBLISHING COMPANY INC, LANCASTER, PENNSYLVANIA, XP002125454
  • [L] JAMES E. MARK: "Physical Properties of Polymers Handbook", 1996, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, WOODBURY, NEW YORK, XP002125453

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0956973 A2 19991117; EP 0956973 A3 20000223; EP 0956973 B1 20030730; DE 59906409 D1 20030904; JP H11342583 A 19991214; US 6041706 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906409

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120422

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120422

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110504

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-11-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-11-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906409 P 20030904

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020904

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000314

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI