Global Patent Index - EP 0957006 A3

EP 0957006 A3 2002-09-04 - Transparent removable protecting screen for a taxi

Title (en)

Transparent removable protecting screen for a taxi

Title (de)

Durchsichtiger, abnehmbarer Schutzschirm für ein Taxi

Title (fr)

Ecran de protection transparent et démontable pour taxi

Publication

EP 0957006 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99108482 A

Priority

IT BO980313 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957006A2] A sole thief-proof transparent shab-shape screen in polycarbonate material of appropriate thickness to be made for pressing is provided with dimension in relation to that of the car on which it mast be mounted. Said screen is shaped with back convexity (1) to be in relation with the back limit encumbrance where arrive the backs of the front seats so permitting their containment into a sheltered front space. The same screen lower ending with a rectilinear border to be in parallel with the bottom on the back borders of the front seats and externally having an outline in comparison with the cabin transversal section with in prosecution a receded border (2) with spaced holes (3). For the mounting the screen (1) is to be preliminary attached to an aluminium alloy draw piece support frame (4), to be shaped in comparison with the border (2), by constraint means (5) to be inerted into the holes (3) of the screen border (2) and the holes (6) of the frame (4). The formed body is then to be solidary connected on its outline on the side and roof walls of the cabin by other passing means (7) to be inserted through spaced holes (8) onto the frame (4). In this way it is realized, for the condition of contact between the screen and the back parts of the front seats (9), a bar barrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 21/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957006 A2 19991117; EP 0957006 A3 20020904; IT 1300036 B1 20000404; IT BO980313 A1 19991115; IT BO980313 D0 19980515

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI