Global Patent Index - EP 0957045 B1

EP 0957045 B1 2002-09-04 - Packaging with packaging sheet with integral opening- and reclosing system

Title (en)

Packaging with packaging sheet with integral opening- and reclosing system

Title (de)

Verpackungsbehälter mit einer Verpackungsfolie mit integriertem Oeffnungs- und Wiederverschliesssystem

Title (fr)

Emballage avec feuille d'emballage avec système d'ouverture et de fermeture intégré

Publication

EP 0957045 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810434 A

Priority

EP 98810434 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957045A1] The packaging film (12) comprises two films connected by a permanent adhesive (38) away from the opening and reclosure system (18). The inner film (28) has a first perforation (32) forming an opening (22) and an outer film (30) has a second perforation (34) forming a closure flap (20) covering the first perforation. A semi-permanent adhesive (24) between both films under the closure flap hold the latter closed. Independent claims are made for: a) a packaging container using the packaging film; b) a process for the continuous manufacture of a packaging film with an integrated system for opening and reclosure of a package using the film (12) in which the outer film (30) is coated with both the permanent (38) and semi-permanent (24) adhesives, the second and first perforations are cut in both films and these are joined together; b) process equipment for manufacturing the packaging film with first and second coating stations for applying the permanent and semi-permanent adhesives onto the outer film, two cutting stations for producing both sets of perforations in the appropriate films, a coating station for joining both films together to form the film and a process control unit. The second perforations preferably do not penetrate through the entire thickness of the outer film. The closure flap (20) is free of adhesive and forms a gripping and tear-off aid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5855 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957045 A1 19991117; EP 0957045 B1 20020904; CA 2270572 A1 19991113; DE 59805411 D1 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805411 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-01-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-10-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PACKAGING WITH PACKAGING SHEET WITH INTEGRAL OPENING- AND RECLOSING SYSTEM

2000-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-07-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI