Global Patent Index - EP 0957059 A3

EP 0957059 A3 2000-12-20 - Safety braking device for an elevator

Title (en)

Safety braking device for an elevator

Title (de)

Sicherheitsbremsfangvorrichtung für einen Aufzug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de freinage d'urgence pour un ascenseur

Publication

EP 0957059 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99500075 A

Priority

ES 9800998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957059A2] The cabin braking device (1) is the caliper type (3), which straddles the rail (21) and has its housing (20) secured to the cabin. It is operated by a lever (10) in both the upward and downward direction in the event of overspeed, and it is provided with a mechanism (5,11,12,13) for operating the caliper (3), a pivoting wedge (6) moved by roller (5) in ore direction or the other, and roller (5) travel stops (3a) and springs (9) to adjust the braking force in either direction independently. The braking device components form a single and indivisible active part (2) in the housing (20), which moves (22) in relation to the latter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957059 A2 19991117; EP 0957059 A3 20001220; ES 2146167 A1 20000716; ES 2146167 B1 20010401

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061031

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL PT

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL PT

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI