Global Patent Index - EP 0957062 A3

EP 0957062 A3 2001-03-21 - Linkage with reduced starting load for moving the ramps of compact auto lifts for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Linkage with reduced starting load for moving the ramps of compact auto lifts for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Hebebühne für Fahrzeuge mit Lenker zum Verringern von dem Anfangshubkraft

Title (fr)

Plate-forme de levage pour véhicules avec une tringlerie pour réduire l' effort de levage au début du déploiement

Publication

EP 0957062 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99109616 A

Priority

IT MO980104 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957062A2] A linkage with reduced starting load for moving the ramps (1) of compact auto lifts comprising a base carriage (4) which can slide at floor level on a corresponding footing (5) and has a preset horizontal stroke, an end of a fluid-actuated actuator (6) and a contiguous end of a linkage element (7) being respectively coarticulated to said carriage (4), the length of said actuator (6) being axially variable, said linkage element (7) having eccentric means (8) for a partial rotation of said linkage element (7) on a vertical plane, the opposite end of said linkage element (7) being in turn slidingly articulated in a hinge-like manner, by way of corresponding articulation means (9), to the body of a lever (10) for lifting the corresponding ramp (2) by contact, the opposite end of said actuator (6) being articulated to a rod-like member (2) which composes a pantograph structure for lifting said ramps (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/0666 (2013.01); B66F 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957062 A2 19991117; EP 0957062 A3 20010321; EP 0957062 B1 20040728; DE 69918896 D1 20040902; DE 69918896 T2 20041216; IT 1304631 B1 20010328; IT MO980104 A1 19991115

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025554

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-06-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918896 P 20040902

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI