Global patent index - EP 0957158 A4

EP 0957158 A4 2000-04-05 - SHEETLIKE ARTICLE FOR WASHING

Title (en)

SHEETLIKE ARTICLE FOR WASHING

Title (de)

TUCHÄHNLICHER GEGENSTAND ZUM WASCHEN

Title (fr)

ARTICLE EN FORME DE FEUILLE POUR LE LAVAGE

Publication

EP 0957158 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97950419 A

Priority

  • JP 9704870 W
  • JP 1016897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957158A1] To provide a sheetlike article for laundry which is freed from the scattering or leak of the contents, facilitates arbitrary dispensing and exhibits excellent detergency even when used alone, sheetlike water-soluble substrates are arranged on both surfaces of a thin layer made of a doughy non-phosphate detergent composition which contains nonionic surfactant(s), alkaline agent(s) and sequestering agent(s) and has a penetration hardness at 25 DEG C of from 0.1 to 10 kg/cm<2>. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/66 (2013.01); C11D 3/001 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 17/041 (2013.01); C11D 17/044 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] US 5202045 A 19930413 - KARPUSIEWICZ WILLIAM M [US], et al
  • [E] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 08 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)
  • See also references of WO 9832835A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957158 A1 19991117; EP 0957158 A4 20000405; EP 0957158 B1 20031119; CN 1177025 C 20041124; CN 1248998 A 20000329; DE 69726314 D1 20031224; DE 69726314 T2 20040826; JP 3126675 B2 20010122; JP H10204499 A 19980804; WO 9832835 A1 19980730

INPADOC legal status

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141226

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141226

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69726314

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69726314

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAYASHI, HIROMITSU,C/O KAO CORPORATION

2003-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SAIJO, HIROYUKI,C/O KAO CORPORATION

2003-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HANADA, HIROHIKO,C/O KAO CORPORATION

2003-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NISHI, TOSHIKI,C/O KAO CORPORATION

2003-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NAKAO, SHINJI,C/O KAO CORPORATION

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020307

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 11D 17/00 A, 7C 11D 17/04 B, 7C 11D 1/66 B

2000-04-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB