Global Patent Index - EP 0957178 A3

EP 0957178 A3 2000-02-23 - Method for the production of white sugar of commercial quality from microfiltered or ultrafiltered raw beet juice

Title (en)

Method for the production of white sugar of commercial quality from microfiltered or ultrafiltered raw beet juice

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Weisszucker mit Handelsqualität aus mikro- oder ultrafiltiriertem rohem Rübensaft

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de sucre blanc de qualité commerciale à partir de jus de betteraves brut microfiltré ou ultrafiltré

Publication

EP 0957178 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99108020 A

Priority

IT GE980039 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957178A2] Method for the preparation of white sugar of commercial quality from raw beet sugar, including the following operations: a) microfiltration or ultrafiltration of the juice, after separating the organic and mineral particles whose size is above 50 microns, using membranes whose size is between 5000 MWCO and 0.5 micron; b) juice sweetening; c) juice concentration in multi-effect evaporators; d) cooling crystallisation of the juice thus obtained; e) separation and washing of the crystals. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C13D 3/16; C13F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C13B 20/16 (2011.01); C13B 30/02 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C13B 30/02 (2013.01); C13B 20/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DX] US 5554227 A 19960910 - KWOK ROBERT J [US], et al
  • [X] US 4115147 A 19780919 - SHIMIZU JUNICHI, et al
  • [X] WO 9527798 A1 19951019 - INT FOOD PROCESSING INC [US]
  • [AX] VACCARI G: "Elimination of the traditional purification by raw juice crystallization", L'INDUSTRIA SACCARIFERA ITALIANA, vol. 90, no. 5, pages 151-161, XP000865517
  • [AX] VACCARI & AL.: "Cooling crystallization or raw juice:Results of the second years pilot plant experimentation", INTERNATIONAL SUGAR JOURNAL, vol. 95, no. 1138, Ferrara, pages 381-390, XP000857744

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957178 A2 19991117; EP 0957178 A3 20000223; IT 1304373 B1 20010315; IT GE980039 A1 19991115; IT GE980039 D0 19980513

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040422

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-06-14 [K1C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ERIDANIA S.P.A.

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECNIMONT S.P.A.

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB NL

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI