Global Patent Index - EP 0957187 A3

EP 0957187 A3 2000-08-16 - Apparatus and process for the production of microfilament yarns with high titer regularity from thermoplastic polymers

Title (en)

Apparatus and process for the production of microfilament yarns with high titer regularity from thermoplastic polymers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mikrofilamenten von hoher Titer-Gleichmässigkeit aus thermoplastischen Polymeren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la fabrication de fils microfilaments avec haute regularité de titre à base de polymères thermoplastiques

Publication

EP 0957187 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109026 A

Priority

DE 19821778 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957187A2] Microfilament yarns of less than 500 dtex are spun with spinnerets with a hole density of up to 40 holes/cm<2> with radial outflow cooling air from a central cooling unit (5) with integrated holder and air supply duct (7) at a distance (S) from the spinneret (2). The value of S in mm is given by a specified equation (I). Microfilament yarns of less than 500 dtex are spun with spinnerets with a hole density of up to 40 holes/cm<2> with radial outflow cooling air from a central cooling unit (5) with integrated holder and air supply duct (7) at a distance (S) from the spinneret (2). The value of S in mm is given by equation (I). S = ((1.4 x exp(2.01 x TEK))/<4> square root of RL) -1 (I) TEK = the dtex value per filament; and RL = the number of rows of holes. An Independent claim is also included for the process of spinning yarns between 22 and 500 dtex with filaments below 1 dtex at 2000-7000 m/min with cooling air starting at a distance (S) given by formula (I). The maximum value of (S) is 35 mm, the spinneret surface is cooled uniformly up to 10 degrees C below the melt temperature and the solidification point is 1-40 mm beyond the end of the cooling unit (5), depending on yarn thickness and speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/08; D01D 5/088

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/08 (2006.01); D01D 5/088 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/088 (2013.01); D01D 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957187 A2 19991117; EP 0957187 A3 20000816; CN 1105196 C 20030409; CN 1236029 A 19991124; DE 19821778 A1 19991118; DE 19821778 B4 20040506; JP H11350238 A 19991221; KR 19990088232 A 19991227; TR 9901078 A2 19991221; TR 9901078 A3 19991221; TW 493017 B 20020701; US 6174474 B1 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081113

2008-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2006-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UHDE INVENTA-FISCHER AG

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INVENTA-FISCHER AG

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IE IT

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INVENTA-FISCHER AG

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI