Global Patent Index - EP 0957190 B1

EP 0957190 B1 2002-11-13 - Thread clamping device, more especially for the patterning weft in Jacquard looms

Title (en)

Thread clamping device, more especially for the patterning weft in Jacquard looms

Title (de)

Fadenklemmvorrichtung, insbesondere für Figurschussfäden bei Jacquardmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pince-fil, plus particulièrement pour la trame à dessin dans les métiers à tisser Jacquard

Publication

EP 0957190 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104558 A

Priority

DE 19821028 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821028C1] The yarn clamp assembly (5,6) for patterning wefts in a Jacquard loom is controlled by the harness cord (3) of the associated patterning weft heald (2). The yarn clamp (5,6) has a sprung clamping plate (5) to secure the weft (1). It is linked to the harness cord (3) for the heald (2) by a draw cord (8), or the like. The clamping plate (5) works with a swing lever (7), with one end attached to the draw cord (8) secured to the harness cord (3). The yarn clamping plate (5) can be moved by an electromagnet into the release position, operated by the electronic control for the harness cord (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 3/24; D03D 47/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 3/40 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/125 (2013.01); D03D 47/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821028 C1 19990819; CN 1131903 C 20031224; CN 1235213 A 19991117; EP 0957190 A1 19991117; EP 0957190 B1 20021113; ES 2186265 T3 20030501; HK 1021212 A1 20030417; JP H11335940 A 19991207; TW 420735 B 20010201; US 6109307 A 20000829

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070308

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MAGEBA TEXTILMASCHINEN G.M.B.H. + CO

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060309

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060308

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-03-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060308

2005-03-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186265 T3

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH ES FR GB IT LI

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020313

2000-08-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-07-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAGEBA TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH + CO

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH ES FR GB IT LI

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI