Global Patent Index - EP 0957205 B1

EP 0957205 B1 2004-12-22 - Roadpaver

Title (en)

Roadpaver

Title (de)

Strassenfertiger

Title (fr)

Finisseur

Publication

EP 0957205 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99108175 A

Priority

DE 19821091 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821091C1] The machine (1) for laying a road surface is a tracked vehicle (2) followed by a further tracked road surface laying machine (13). It has a leading tub (11) to hold the road surface material and a trailing floating leveling board (5). A shaft carries the material to longitudinal conveyors (10) for deposit in front of the leveler (5). One of the conveyors (10) is extended at the shaft outlet over the leveling board (5) to an additional conveyor, with its delivery end over the height of the storage tub (11). A vertical dividing plate directs the material to the conveyors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2013.01); E01C 2301/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821091 C1 19990819; BR 9901430 A 20000502; CA 2270506 A1 19991112; CA 2270506 C 20050607; CN 1144912 C 20040407; CN 1235222 A 19991117; EP 0957205 A1 19991117; EP 0957205 B1 20041222; JP 4246849 B2 20090402; JP H11336014 A 19991207; US 6193438 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170426

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170426

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171103

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170502

2018-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171229

2017-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911304

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911304 P 20050127

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030730

2000-07-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI