Global patent index - EP 0957215 A3

EP 0957215 A3 2000-01-12 - A protecting device to avoid corrosion in building materials

Title (en)

A protecting device to avoid corrosion in building materials

Title (de)

Schutzvorrichtung zur Vermeidung von Baustoffkorrosion

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection pour éviter la corrosion d'un matériau de construction

Publication

EP 0957215 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109467 A

Priority

  • DE 19821139 A
  • DE 19918579 A
  • DE 19918739 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0957215A2] The guard comprises a profile (3) with a transition region (4) forming a bridge between a flat surface (1) in the building and an adjacent wall (2). The profile is secured to the wall adjoining the flat surface. The transition region is formed by an L-shaped or cylindrical mantle containing grooves (5), and is integrally linked to the mounting region (8) of the profile secured to the wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1415 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0957215 A2 19991117; EP 0957215 A3 20000112

INPADOC legal status

2001-05-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-04-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI