Global patent index - EP 0957221 A3

EP 0957221 A3 2001-03-28 - Lock for an access door

Title (en)

Lock for an access door

Title (de)

Zugangstürschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure pour porte d'accès

Publication

EP 0957221 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107787 A

Priority

DE 29807861 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: BG488Y1] The lock has an additional interlocking mechanism and is suitable for mounting on entrance or main storey doors in order to improve their stability against breaking in. It consists of a box (1), mounted to a front plate (2), tongue (5) with a comb (6) and additional locking lever (11), driven by a pawl (4) of the safety lock (3). Under hole (1a) a safe-type lock (7) is built-in, on the tongue (8) of which a fixed pin (8a) is fitted, found opposite shuttles (9), which have grooves (9a). Tongue (8) has an extension (10) with several bent teeth (10a), which mesh the toothed part (11) of the additional locking lever (11) and interlock it in any locking position. The extension (10), under the pressure of spring (12) can be manually shifted by means of a pin (13) mounted on it, found on the internal side of the door. 3 claims, 2 figures

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/14; E05B 59/00; E05B 63/00; E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/0017 (2013.01); E05C 9/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29807861 U1 19980723; BG 103145 U 19991130; BG 488 Y1 20011031; EP 0957221 A2 19991117; EP 0957221 A3 20010328

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010929

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05B 63/14 A, 7E 05B 63/00 B, 7E 05B 59/00 B, 7E 05C 9/04 B

1999-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI